Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Do Pass Executive; 012-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|