Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Postponed - Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Postponed - Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|