House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | To Higher Ed-Scholarship & Tuition Assistance Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Higher Education Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |