House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |