House
|
05/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|