House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0830
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|