Senate | 05/22/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-001 | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000 | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 068-038-000 | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Police & Fire Committee; Rep. Robyn Gabel | ||
House | 05/17/2024 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 | ||
House | 05/17/2024 | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Gaming Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |