House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 014-000-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |