House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0834
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|