House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-006-000 | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |