House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias |