House
|
08/02/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0730
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass Transportation; 013-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|