Senate | 04/23/2024 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2024 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |