House
|
08/02/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0732
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Effective Date August 2, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Licensed Activities
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Health Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|