House
|
08/02/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0734
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass Public Health; 006-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Health Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|