Senate
|
12/22/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 007-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|