House
|
05/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|