House
|
08/05/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0737
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 040-015-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-038-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 012-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Housing
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|