House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |