House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0839
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
|
|
|