Senate
|
12/22/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 12, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/06/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 007-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Referred to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|