Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|