House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
To Revenue - Sales, Amusement and Other Taxes Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|