House
|
05/31/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Racial Impact Note Requested by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Pension Note Requested by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Gill
|
|
|