House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Fiscal Note Filed | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 017-010-000 | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |