Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 105-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Standard Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Higher Education Committee; 007-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|