House | 04/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |