House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 009-000-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |