House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|