House
|
05/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Referred to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|