House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0846
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date August 9, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 102-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Education; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments:
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-020-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|