House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Executive Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|