House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|