House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |