Senate | 04/30/2024 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Arrive in Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-032-000 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-006-000 | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sharon Chung |