House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-027-001
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|