House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0850
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 049-009-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Health and Human Services; 009-005-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass Health and Human Services; 008-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|