House | 09/04/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |