House | 04/26/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice; 008-000-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Restorative Justice | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |