House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens | ||
House | 03/07/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicole La Ha |