House
|
07/19/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0694
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 018-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|