Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee; 012-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|