House | 04/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | To Occupational Licenses Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |