House
|
06/29/2024
|
Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 007-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Health Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|