Senate
|
12/22/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/22/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Do Pass Executive; 009-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/13/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/28/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/22/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/15/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Natalie Toro
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-039-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|