Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|