House | 04/15/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |