House
|
08/02/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0743
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Effective Date August 2, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Do Pass Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|