House
|
07/19/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0700
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
07/19/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass Insurance; 010-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|