Senate | 04/19/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel | ||
Senate | 04/19/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-003-000 | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-001-000 | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |